WY SF0049 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the licensure of denturists; creating a board of denturists; regulating the practice of denturism; providing for licensing, fees, examinations and other regulation of denturists; repealing prohibition on soliciting for denturism services; providing criminal penalties for violations of denturist act; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Denturists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW | |
2011-02-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Dockstader, Nutting and Scott Nayes: Senator(s) Martin and Schiffer Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-02 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-30 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0049.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0049.pdf |