WY SF0046 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to controlled substances; establishing a limit for opioid prescriptions as specified; providing authority to establish exemptions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Opioid prescription limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 166 | |
2019-02-28 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0068 | |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2019-02-26 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0068 | |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Concur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-14 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-11 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |