WY SF0042 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 104 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 104 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; amending the Occupational Therapy Practice Act; adding and amending definitions; defining unprofessional conduct; amending the scope of practice; amending licensure and temporary licensure standards; amending standards for reentry into the profession; amending provisions related to foreign license applicants; amending continuing education requirements; specifying who must hold a license; specifying the role of unlicensed persons; repealing archaic provisions; amending board duties and procedures; providing for licensure waiver; repealing criminal penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Occupational Therapy Practice Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0042JC002: 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0042JC002: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0042JC001: 21-37-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Adopted SF0042JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0042JC002: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0042JC001: 21-37-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Adopted SF0042JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Chapter No. 104 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-11 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0060 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0060 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0060 |
2016-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0060 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Adopted SF0042JC002: 41-19-0-0-0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Adopted SF0042JC002: 27-2-1-0-0 |
2016-03-03 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2016-03-03 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2016-03-02 | House | Did Not Adopt SF0042JC001: 21-37-2-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Adopted SF0042JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2016-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 |
2016-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-23 | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2016-02-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-09 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |