WY SF0041 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 97 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state funded facilities; providing appropriations for state funded capital construction for the biennium commencing July 1, 2016 and ending June 30, 2018; continuing and codifying state facility accounts as specified; continuing the task force on department of health facilities; providing definitions; providing for conditions and other requirements related to state funded capital construction appropriations; repealing provisions related to University of Wyoming matching fund requirements in prior capital construction appropriations; providing for funding of mineral impacted road projects; providing appropriations; providing for carryover appropriations; and providing effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State funded capital construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-24-1-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-24-1-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 97 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0029
2016-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0029
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0029
2016-03-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0029
2016-03-01SenateConcur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0
2016-03-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-01House3rd Reading:Passed 35-24-1-0-0
2016-02-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-26HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
2016-02-18Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-17Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-16SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback