WY SF0041 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the select federal natural resource management committee; modifying criteria for membership and duties of the committee; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Select federal natural resource management committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - H Adopted SF0041JC01 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Adopted SF0041JC01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0060
2014-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0060
2014-03-06SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0060
2014-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0060
2014-03-05HouseAdopted SF0041JC01
2014-03-04SenateAdopted SF0041JC01
2014-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2014-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2014-03-03SenateDid Not Concur
2014-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2014-02-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-25HousePassed COW
2014-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-21HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-19HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2014-02-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-14SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-13SenatePassed COW
2014-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-12SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2014-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback