WY SF0040 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to tax administration; providing for certification of specified cases directly to the state board of equalization; providing standing for a county assessor to appeal a decision of the state board of equalization as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Certification of cases to state board of equalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Adopted SF0040JC001: 50-3-7-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 147 | |
2020-03-24 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0062 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2020-03-12 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0062 | |
2020-03-10 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 |
2020-03-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-02 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2020-02-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-11 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |