WY SF0040 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 116 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to abandoned mine land funds; authorizing application for funds; appropriating and specifying authorized use of funds; reappropriating prior authorizations; redirecting prior authorizations; specifying and amending reversion dates for funds; extending the University of Wyoming reclamation and restoration challenge account; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned mine land funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0040JC001: 53-0-7-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Rescind original vote pursuant to SR 12-11: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0040JC001: 53-0-7-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Rescind original vote pursuant to SR 12-11 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 116 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0062
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0062
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0062
2016-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0062
2016-03-04HouseAdopted SF0040JC001: 53-0-7-0-0
2016-03-04SenateAdopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0
2016-03-04 Rescind original vote pursuant to SR 12-11: 29-0-1-0-0
2016-03-03SenateAdopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0
2016-03-03SenateAdopted SF0040JC001: 27-2-1-0-0
2016-03-02HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-01SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-01SenateConcur:Failed 10-20-0-0-0
2016-03-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
2016-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-18Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
2016-02-17Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-16Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-15SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback