WY SF0039 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water; requiring legislative approval of actions affecting interstate water compacts; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative approval of water compact amendments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2019-02-01SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback