WY SF0035 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to defense forces and affairs; providing servicemembers protections when terminating, suspending or reinstating contract services; requiring notice; making conforming amendments; providing applicability; establishing a penalty; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Military Service Relief Act additional protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-20-0-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0029 |
2018-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0029 | |
2018-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-20-0-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2018-02-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |