WY SF0035 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; repealing the pay-per-signature prohibition for referendum petition circulators; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Referendum-circulator payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 23- (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 23- (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 10-20-0-0-0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-09 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0035.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/SF0035.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0035.pdf |