WY SF0034 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 39 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to fiduciaries; providing fiduciaries access to electronic records of a user of an electronic communication service as specified; specifying procedures for disclosure of electronic records; imposing duties on fiduciaries and custodians of electronic records; specifying applicability; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 39 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0025
2016-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0025
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0025
2016-03-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0025
2016-02-29SenateConcur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2016-02-29SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2016-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2016-02-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-12Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-11SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback