WY SF0033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - COW:Failed 7-21-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; amending penalties for the offenses of cruelty to animals and aggravated cruelty to animals as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cruelty to animals-penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - COW:Failed 7-21-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateCOW:Failed 7-21-2-0-0
2019-01-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-15SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback