WY SF0033 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; creating a new department of enterprise technology services; specifying powers and duties of department; placing the state chief information officer in the position of director of the department of enterprise technology services; removing the division of information technology from the department of administration and information and generally transferring functions of the division to the new department; transferring other information technology related functions as specified; authorizing the transfer of positions and funds; providing for subsequent budgeting of the new department; providing for a study; providing for reports; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Department of enterprise technology services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA0020 | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0020 | |
2012-03-05 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0020 | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA0020 | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Did Concur | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-01 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-28 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-17 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |