WY SF0030 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the military department; creating a fund for the deposit of monies from grazing fees at military training areas as specified; authorizing the adjutant general to administer the fund and expend monies for range management operations; requiring annual reports; providing for a continuous appropriation; providing for a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Camp Guernsey-range management fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Failed 2-27-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Failed 2-27-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-09Senatepostponed indefinitely
2015-03-06SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26SenateConcur:Failed 2-27-1-0-0
2015-02-26SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0
2015-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-18 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2015-02-11HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-11 Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2015-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
2015-01-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-19SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-19SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-19 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2015-01-15SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-01-15SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-15 Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-12-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback