WY SF0028 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 85 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to environmental quality; specifying criteria for the conversion of an enhanced oil and gas recovery carbon dioxide injection permit to a geologic sequestration permit; providing authority to the director of the department of environmental quality for conversion of a permit as specified; providing for findings and recommendations of the conversion of a permit by the oil and gas conservation commission supervisor; providing notice and opportunity for hearing; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carbon capture, storage and sequestration permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 85 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0026
2016-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0026
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0026
2016-03-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0026
2016-02-29SenateConcur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2016-02-29SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29House3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0
2016-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2016-02-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-12Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-10SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-10 S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback