WY SF0023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 20 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 20 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the state board of equalization; providing for appeals of fuel taxes to the board; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fuel tax appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 20 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0003 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2017-02-13 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0003 | |
2017-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-06 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2017-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |