WY SF0022 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health and safety; clarifying the time for appealing certain agency actions with respect to a clandestine laboratory operation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clandestine laboratory operation appeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Assigned Chapter Number
2012-03-06 Governor Signed SEA0004
2012-03-02 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0004
2012-03-01 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0004
2012-03-01 Assigned Number SEA0004
2012-03-01 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-29 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-28 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-23 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-23 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-22 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2012-02-17 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-17 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-16 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-15 (S) Passed CoW
2012-02-15 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-15 (S01) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-13 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2012-02-13 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback