WY SF0022 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wind energy property rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wind energy property rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-10 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-15 Assigned Chapter Number
2011-02-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0003
2011-02-11 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0003
2011-02-11 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0003
2011-02-10 Assigned Number SEA No. 0003
2011-02-10 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-09 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-08 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-07 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-07 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-31 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2011-01-28 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-27 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-26 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-25 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-24 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-24 (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-11 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-12-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback