WY SF0021 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to substance abuse and mental health treatment; amending the Court Supervised Treatment Programs Act to specify that certain accreditations are not required for reimbursement; specifying that certain accreditations are not necessary for reimbursement of substance abuse and mental health services; specifying applicability; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Substance abuse and mental health-accreditation amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2022-02-21 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-2-0-0-0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |