WY SF0021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administrative procedure; amending the permissible district courts where judicial review for agency actions may be sought; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Judicial review of agency actions-permissible venues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-1-1-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-1-1-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Assigned Chapter Number 55 | |
2021-04-01 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0016 | |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0016 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0016 |
2021-03-26 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0016 | |
2021-03-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-1-1-0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |