WY SF0021 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 160 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 160 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to vital records; providing that an advanced practice registered nurse or physician assistant may complete the medical certification of a death certificate as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Death certificates.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] |
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Chapter No. 160 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0066 | |
2017-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0066 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0066 |
2017-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0066 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 |
2017-02-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-18 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-07 | Bill Number Assigned |