WY SF0020 | 2020 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; revising registration requirements and election timelines as specified; creating requirements for write-in candidates; allowing notification to nominated write-in candidates by electronic means; amending complaint procedures for violations of the Election Code as specified; expanding limitations on campaign contributions; amending provisions relating to publishing notice of special district organizational and formation elections; modifying post voting procedures; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election code revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Amendment failed 25-34-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Amendment failed 15-15-0-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13 Assigned Chapter Number 100
2020-03-13 Governor Signed SEA No. 0036
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0036
2020-03-09SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0036
2020-03-09 Assigned Number SEA No. 0036
2020-03-09SenateConcur:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
2020-03-09SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-05House3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0
2020-03-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-03HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-26HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2020-02-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2020-02-21HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-20Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
2020-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-18Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-17SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-13SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 25-4-1-0-0
2020-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-12-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback