WY SF0020 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to child custody; providing that no form of custody may be favored or disfavored, including joint custody; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody in the best interest of the children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0014
2018-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0014
2018-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0014
2018-03-05House3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2018-03-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-01HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-27HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2018-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2018-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-14SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-14SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 28-1-1-0-0
2018-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-12-19 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback