WY SF0019 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to special hospital districts; specifying the procedure for establishing a special hospital district and subsequent district elections; making conforming changes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hospital district-elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Geis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA27 | |
2013-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0027 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0027 |
2013-02-13 | Assigned Number SEA0027 | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Did Concur |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-11 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-11 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-05 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |