WY SF0019 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to driving under the influence; amending the time in which a driver may not exceed the maximum blood alcohol level; making corresponding amendments for youthful driver's with detectable alcohol concentrations; amending the time in which chemical tests may be relevant; expanding the period for enhanced penalties for prior violations; expanding the period for license suspension and revocation as specified; adding definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
DUI impairment period and period for enhanced penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-03 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0011 | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0011 | |
2010-03-01 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0011 | |
2010-02-26 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0011 | |
2010-02-22 | (H01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2009-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |