WY SF0014 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to penal institutions; expanding correctional industries program; clarifying provisions; amending procurement requirements relating to correctional industries program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Correctional industries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-11 | Governor Signed SEA0008 | |
2013-02-07 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0008 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0008 |
2013-02-07 | Assigned Number SEA0008 | |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-06 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-05 | Bill Number Assigned |