WY SF0013 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; amending the method of execution of a death sentence; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Method of execution-1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0013JC002: 28-31-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0013JC002: 28-31-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0013JC002: 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0013JC002: 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0013JC001: 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0013JC001: 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Adopted SF0013JC001: 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Adopted SF0013JC001: 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Concur:Failed 14-12-4-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-28-0-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Concur:Failed 14-12-4-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-28-0-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-1-0 (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-09Senatepostponed indefinitely
2015-03-06SenateAppointed JCC03 Members
2015-03-05HouseAppointed JCC03 Members
2015-03-05SenateAppointed JCC03 Members
2015-03-03HouseDid Not Adopt SF0013JC002: 28-31-1-0-0
2015-03-02SenateAdopted SF0013JC002: 29-1-0-0-0
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC02 Members
2015-02-26SenateAppointed JCC02 Members
2015-02-25HouseDid Not Adopt SF0013JC001: 30-29-1-0-0
2015-02-24SenateAdopted SF0013JC001: 29-1-0-0-0
2015-02-18HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-17SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-12SenateConcur:Failed 14-12-4-0-0
2015-02-12SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-12House3rd Reading:Passed 32-28-0-0-0
2015-02-11House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-10HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-09HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-09 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2015-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-1-0-0
2015-01-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-14SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-14 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2015-01-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-12-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback