WY SF0010 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; authorizing warrants to out-of-state providers of electronic communication services and remote computing services; specifying procedures; requiring Wyoming providers to comply with out-of-state warrants as specified; providing immunity for compliance; defining terms; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Warrants for digital records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2020-02-27 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2020-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 27-2-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-10 | Bill Number Assigned |