WY SF0010 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0027
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public utilities; providing for nonpreferential pricing for electrical generation when fixing rates; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utilities-rate making.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0027
2018-03-07SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0027
2018-03-07 Assigned Number SEA No. 0027
2018-03-07SenateConcur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2018-03-06SenateReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-06House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-03-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-02HouseCOW:Passed
2018-03-01HousePlaced on General File
2018-03-01HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2018-02-21HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-20Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2018-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-16SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-15SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0
2018-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-12-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback