WY HJ0007 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the constitution related to education; providing for a state tax for the construction and maintenance of public school facilities in the state.
Title
Property tax for school facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0- (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2017-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |