WY HJ0006 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to issue a moratorium on the closing of United States Postal Service offices in Wyoming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Post office closures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-29 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 5 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-29 (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
2012-02-28 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-28 (S07) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-23 (S) Introduced and Referred to S07
2012-02-23 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-23 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-22 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-21 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-20 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-20 (H04) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-15 (H) Introduced and Referred to H04
2012-02-14 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback