WY HJ0002 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION petitioning Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States to require a balanced federal budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Balanced budget amendment-resolution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-18 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-16 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17 Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002
2017-02-28SenatePresident Signed HEJR No. 0002
2017-02-28HouseSpeaker Signed HEJR No. 0002
2017-02-27 Assigned Number HEJR No. 0002
2017-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
2017-02-24Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2017-02-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-22SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-14SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2017-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-19House3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0
2017-01-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-17HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-16HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2017-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-12-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback