WY HB1006 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring health care facilities, governmental entities and providers of essential services to offer reasonable accommodations as specified to persons unable or unwilling to provide proof of immunization; creating a personal exemption to mandatory immunizations for school children; providing that requiring immunization as a condition of employment is a discriminatory or unfair employment practice as specified; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vaccine requirements-limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-10-27 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2021-10-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2021-10-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-10-21 | Bill Number Assigned |