WY HB0284 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - COW:Failed 17-42-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to gaming; providing for regulation of video skill games by the lottery corporation; requiring permitting of dealers of video skill games; providing for fees; providing for criminal history record checks; providing penalties; providing rulemaking authority; authorizing play on video skill games; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video skill games-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - COW:Failed 17-42-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Failed 17-42-1-0-0
2019-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-31HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback