WY HB0267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to corporations and limited liability companies; altering licensing fees for corporations and limited liability companies; and providing for an effective date.
Title
LLC and corporation license fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Obermueller [R] | Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-15-2-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-15-2-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 43-15-2-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-01 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |