WY HB0265 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to offenses against property; modifying requisite property values for specified felony offenses; creating new high misdemeanor penalties for property offenses as specified; increasing a civil penalty for shoplifting; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-20SenateS01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0
2019-02-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback