WY HB0246 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to pension accounts; amending the volunteer firefighter and EMT pension account to provide membership for volunteer search and rescue personnel; providing for contributions to the account; increasing insurance premiums to the account as specified; amending membership of the pension account board; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer pension account-search and rescue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 83
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0055
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0055
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0055
2019-02-20 Assigned Number HEA No. 0055
2019-02-20Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-15SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-13SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback