WY HB0243 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 185 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; defining the type of conduct that constitutes child abuse; providing for an increase in penalties as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 185 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0094
2015-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0094
2015-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0094
2015-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0094
2015-03-03Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-03-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-27SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-27 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-09House3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0
2015-02-06House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-05HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-05HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-05 Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-02HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-02-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-02 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback