WY HB0241 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to student assessments; phasing out use of school district body of evidence systems for establishing high school graduation requirements; providing for further study and subsequent legislation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School districts-assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-09 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Zwonitzer, Dn. Excused: Representative(s) Shepperson Ayes 58 Nays 1 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-07 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-04 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Burkhart, Connolly, Freeman, Kroeker, Krone, Loucks, Madden and Teeters Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-04 | (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |