WY HB0238 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 190 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating offenses for the dissemination or possession of a nude image of a minor by a minor; specifying elements of the offenses; providing definitions; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nude image of a minor disseminated or possessed by a minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Chapter No. 190 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0110
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0110
2017-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0110
2017-03-02 Assigned Number HEA No. 0110
2017-03-02HouseConcur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2017-03-01HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2017-02-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-24SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-24SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2017-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-03House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2017-02-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-01HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-30HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2017-01-26HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback