WY HB0230 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to pari-mutuel events; providing for professional rodeo events as pari-mutuel events; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pari-mutuel events-rodeo.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-11-3-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 20-7-3-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 50-7-3-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 20-7-3-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 50-7-3-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 133 | |
2020-03-24 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0081 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0081 |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0081 |
2020-03-12 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0081 | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-11-3-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 20-7-3-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 50-7-3-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |