WY HB0227 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; allowing supervised use of cannabidiol as specified; providing an exemption from prosecution for possession or use of cannabidiol as specified; authorizing a fee for registration; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabidiol medication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03 H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0
2015-02-09HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-02-04 :Rerefer to H07 - Corporations
2015-02-02HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback