WY HB0214 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 162 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the practice of law; amending, updating and repealing provisions related to the practice of law as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Practice of law-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted HB0214JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted HB0214JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0214JC001: 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0214JC001: 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 162 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0104
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0104
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0104
2015-03-05 Assigned Number HEA No. 0104
2015-03-05SenateAdopted HB0214JC001: 29-0-1-0-0
2015-03-04HouseAdopted HB0214JC001: 49-10-1-0-0
2015-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseConcur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0
2015-02-25HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2015-02-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-23SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-20 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0-0
2015-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-03HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-03 Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback