WY HB0211 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; allowing a motion for new trial for persons convicted of a felony upon a showing of actual innocence based on non-DNA evidence; specifying requirements and conditions; specifying retention of governmental immunity; conforming related provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Post-conviction actual innocence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03 S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
2015-03-03SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0
2015-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-03HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-03 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2015-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback