WY HB0210 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the collection agency board; amending the number of members of the collection agency board as specified; specifying composition of board members; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; requiring appointments as specified; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collection agency board-members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-8-2-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 145
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0087
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0087
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0087
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0087
2019-02-22HouseConcur:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
2019-02-21HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-02-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 50-8-2-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-25HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-25HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback