WY HB0204 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to community colleges and the University of Wyoming; establishing requirements for the community college commission's common college transcript and transfer process system; amending reporting requirements; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common college transcript-implementation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 34-24-2-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-7-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 150
2019-02-28 Governor Signed HEA No. 0096
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0096
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0096
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0096
2019-02-25HouseConcur:Passed 34-24-2-0-0
2019-02-25HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-7-2-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-13SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-31HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-29House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback