WY HB0199 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to virtual education; creating an exception to virtual education requirements; authorizing remote education agreements between school districts; providing requirements for the remote education; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Remote education agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Aaron Clausen [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] |
Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0199JC002: 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0199JC002: 53-0-7-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0199JC002: 53-0-7-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 191 | |
2019-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0118 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0118 |
2019-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0118 |
2019-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0118 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-22 | House | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-19 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-19 | House | Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |