WY HB0197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; increasing permissible school district cash reserves amount; removing obsolete language; and providing for an effective date.
Title
K-12 school district reserve increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-2-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-2-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |