WY HB0195 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to gasoline taxes; authorizing expenditures of amounts attributable to motorboat gasoline tax distributions as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorboats-gasoline tax distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-27SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-26SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0
2020-02-24House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-21House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 52-7-1-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback