WY HB0194 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Chapter No. 209 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school safety and security; allowing possession of firearms by school district employees on school property; providing rulemaking authority to school districts; specifying confidentiality of records; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety and security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - House - Concur:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Concur:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16 Chapter No. 209 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-16 Governor Signed HEA No. 0093
2017-03-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0093
2017-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0093
2017-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0093
2017-02-28HouseConcur:Passed 57-3-0-0-0
2017-02-27HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2017-02-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-23SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-22SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2017-02-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0
2017-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-26HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-26HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2017-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback